U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10258
  • Case Name: Brittany Nickole Hayes
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Financial Management Course]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Objection Deadline]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Relief from Stay]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Request for Notice]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Order on Application to Have Filing Fee Waived]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [BK Petition Preparer's Information]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Declaration Regarding Filing (Self-Represented Individuals)]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Employee Income Records]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [DeBN Request Form]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Statement About Your Social Security Number(s) (Form 121)]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Waiver of Chapter 7 Filing Fee]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [AAutoAsignJudge7]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.