U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-20368
  • Case Name: Lucretia Jeannine Hill
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Allow Claims]
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Objection Deadline]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Order]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Relief from Stay]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Objection Deadline]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Compensation]
April, 2025
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Modify Plan Payments]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Withdraw Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.