U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-21511
  • Case Name: Sierra Dariana Roberts
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Trustee's Interim Report]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Change of Address]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Certificate of Service]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Employ]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Employ]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Notice of Amended Schedule C]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Amended Schedule C (Only)]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Amended Schedules]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Trustee's Interim Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.