U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-20373
  • Case Name: Kimberly Marie McCarbrey
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Trustee's Initial Report]
April, 2025
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Financial Management Course]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • March 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [AAutoAsignJudge7]
  • March 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Order]
  • March 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Employee Income Records]
  • March 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [DeBN Request Form]
  • March 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBR 1007.1(a)(2)(D))]
  • March 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7, Credit Card )]
  • March 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.