U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 23-10589
  • Case Name: Paula Lynn Imsdahl
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 04, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Modify Plan Payments]
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Withdraw Document]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Modify Plan Payment]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Objection Deadline]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Order]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Objection Deadline]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Relief from Stay]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.