U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-05020
  • Case Name: KJB Holdings LLC v. Epic Contracting Services, LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: ap Office: 6 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
  • May 01, 2025: ap Office: 6 Chapter: [Clerk's Notice of Hearing (with form)]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: ap Office: 6 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 28, 2025: ap Office: 6 Chapter: [Clerk's Entry of Default]
  • April 25, 2025: ap Office: 6 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 24, 2025: ap Office: 6 Chapter: [Request For Clerk's Entry of Default Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 7055(a) and FRCP 55(a)]
  • April 23, 2025: ap Office: 6 Chapter: [Generic]
  • April 03, 2025: ap Office: 6 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 01, 2025: ap Office: 6 Chapter: [Default Judgment]
  • April 01, 2025: ap Office: 6 Chapter: [Clerk's Entry of Default]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: ap Office: 6 Chapter: [Request For Clerk's Entry of Default Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 7055(a) and FRCP 55(a)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.