U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-02525
  • Case Name: James v. Kissinger et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Response to Motion]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 25, 2025: [Amend Complaint]
  • April 24, 2025: [Joint Mediation Notice]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • April 04, 2025: [Comparative Fault Designation]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Service]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.