U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10265
  • Case Name: Prairie Lee Todd and Christopher Lee Todd
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Amended Schedules]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Correct Defective Pleading(s)]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Financial Management Course]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [DeBN Request Form]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Employee Income Records]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Verified Mailing Matrix]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Declaration Regarding Filing (Self-Represented Individuals)]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Correct Voluntary Petition]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Receipt of Installment Payment (Final)]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [DeBN Request Form]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Statement About Your Social Security Number(s) (Form 121)]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [AAutoAsignJudge7]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.