U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-20181
  • Case Name: Johnathan Thomas Lazzaro and Rheanna Nicole Lazzaro
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Trustee's Interim Report]
  • April 13, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Employ]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Employ]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Set Last Day To File Proofs of Claim (Late Assets)]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Notice of Recovery of Assets]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Trustee's Initial Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.