U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-20378
  • Case Name: Rebecca Lynn Sowers
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Financial Management Course]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Employee Income Records]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Employee Income Records]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Correct Voluntary Petition]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Order]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [AAutoAsignJudge7]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBR 1007.1(a)(2)(D))]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [DeBN Request Form]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7, Credit Card )]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.