U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10136
  • Case Name: Sonya Michelle Brown
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Rule 5009 Financial Management Notice]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Continue Hearing]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Hearing Set (Other)]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • April 20, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Pay Wages (Debtor)]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Objection Deadline]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Meeting of Creditors Held and Concluded]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.