U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10269
  • Case Name: Garret Joseph Vandenberg
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Meeting of Creditors Held and Concluded]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Fix Claim Owner]
April, 2025
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Pay Wages (Debtor)]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBR 1007.1(a)(2)(D))]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [DeBN Request Form]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Employee Income Records]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Order]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [AAutoAsignJudge13]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13, Credit Card )]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13, Credit Card )]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.