U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-40182
  • Case Name: CPS Operating
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Administrative Expenses]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Continue Hearing]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Status Report]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Meeting of Creditors Held and Concluded]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Adequate Protection]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Objection]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Courtroom Minute Sheet]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Objection Deadline]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Employ]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Objection]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Employ]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Borrow]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Support Document]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Support Document]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Hearing]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Hearing Set (Motion)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Generic]
  • April 20, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Generic]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Objection Deadline]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Administrative Expenses]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Hearing Held (Motion)]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Courtroom Minute Sheet]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Clerk's Notice of Hearing (with form)]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Objection]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Terminating Show Cause Order - Compliance]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Flags Set-Reset]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Compliance]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Generic Notice]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Amendments to Schedules D, E, F, G or H]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Amended Schedules]
  • April 13, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Hearing]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Objection Deadline]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Joint Administration]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Show Cause]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Cash Collateral]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Extend/Shorten Time]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Borrow]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Adequate Protection]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Corporate Ownership Statement]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Debtor-In-Possession To Pay Taxes]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 12]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Correct Voluntary Petition]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Objection Deadline]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Employ]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBR 1007.1(a)(2)(D))]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Affidavit]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Corporate Resolution]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 [Corporate Resolution]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [DeBN Request Form]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 [DeBN Request Form]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 12, Credit Card)]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Order]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 12, Credit Card)]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.