U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10270
  • Case Name: Lawrence Kermith West
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Hearing]
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Dismiss Case]
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Meeting of Creditors Held and Concluded]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Employee Income Records]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Hearing]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Pay Wages (Debtor)]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Directing Service]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Chapter 13 Statement of Monthly Income 122C-1]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Schedule J]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Schedule I]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Schedule H]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Schedule G]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Schedule E/F]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Schedule D]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Schedule C]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Schedule A/B]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Amended Order]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBR 1007.1(a)(2)(D))]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Update Other Deadlines]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Correct Voluntary Petition]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [AAutoAsignJudge13]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13, Credit Card )]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.