U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-20022
  • Case Name: Tabatha Kay Davis
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Final Decree]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Set Last Day To File Proofs of Claim (Late Assets)]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Notice of Recovery of Assets]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.