U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-20389
  • Case Name: Elizabeth Frances Bloemker
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Trustee's Initial Report]
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Financial Management Course]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Receipt of Installment Payment (Final)]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [AAutoAsignJudge7]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [DeBN Request Form]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Employee Income Records]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Declaration Regarding Filing (Self-Represented Individuals)]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Statement About Your Social Security Number(s) (Form 121)]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.