U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10274
  • Case Name: Janine Jean Lovato
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Financial Management Course]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Amendments to Schedules D, E, F, G or H]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Correct Defective Pleading(s)]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Amendments to Schedules D, E, F, G or H]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Amended Schedules]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [AAutoAsignJudge7]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Order]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 [Order]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Employee Income Records]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 [Employee Income Records]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [DeBN Request Form]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBR 1007.1(a)(2)(D))]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 [DeBN Request Form]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBR 1007.1(a)(2)(D))]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7, Credit Card )]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7, Credit Card )]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.