U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10272
  • Case Name: Khylie Renee Burns
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Financial Management Course]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Trustee's Initial Report]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Objection Deadline]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Relief from Stay]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Reaffirmation Reviewed]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [AAutoAsignJudge7]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Order]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 [Order]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Employee Income Records]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 [Employee Income Records]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBR 1007.1(a)(2)(D))]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBR 1007.1(a)(2)(D))]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [DeBN Request Form]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 [DeBN Request Form]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7, Credit Card )]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7, Credit Card )]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.