U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10271
  • Case Name: Christopher Lee Koop
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Dismissing Case - All Debtors]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Dismissal]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Update Other Deadlines]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Correct Voluntary Petition]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [AAutoAsignJudge13]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBR 1007.1(a)(2)(D))]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13, Credit Card )]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.