U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10277
  • Case Name: Billy E McPherson, Jr. and Tisha L Roberts
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Meeting of Creditors Held and Concluded]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Objection Deadline]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Amended Schedules]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Amendments to Schedules D, E, F, G or H]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Financial Management Course]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Request for Notice]
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Pay Wages (Employer)]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBR 1007.1(a)(2)(D))]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [AAutoAsignJudge13]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Order]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 [Order]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [DeBN Request Form]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 [DeBN Request Form]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Employee Income Records]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 [Employee Income Records]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13, Credit Card )]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13, Credit Card )]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.