U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-20391
  • Case Name: Abigail Kayla Lathrop
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Trustee's Initial Report]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Reaffirmation Reviewed]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Reaffirmation Agreement]
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Financial Management Course]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [DeBN Request Form]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Employee Income Records]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Correct Voluntary Petition]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [AAutoAsignJudge7]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Order]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBR 1007.1(a)(2)(D))]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7, Credit Card )]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.