U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-20393
  • Case Name: Jacob T Campbell and Alyssa R Campbell
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Trustee's Initial Report]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Financial Management Course]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Financial Management Course]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Request for Notice]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [AAutoAsignJudge7]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Order]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Order]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBR 1007.1(a)(2)(D))]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBR 1007.1(a)(2)(D))]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Employee Income Records]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [DeBN Request Form]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Employee Income Records]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [DeBN Request Form]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7, Credit Card )]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7, Credit Card )]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.