U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-20090
  • Case Name: Steven William Voorhees and Tina Louise Voorhees
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Trustee's Initial Report]
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report]
  • April 06, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 06, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Upon Converting Case To Chapter 7]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Order]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Support Document]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Voluntary Conversion from Chapter 13 to Chapter 7]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Amended Schedules]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.