U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-20219
  • Case Name: Larry Edwin Wilcox, Jr. and Danielle Leann Wilcox
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Order]
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Filing Fee Payment Ch 13]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Courtroom Minute Entry (Auto Confirm)]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Amended Schedule C (Only)]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Notice of Amended Schedule C]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Correct Defective Pleading(s)]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Meeting of Creditors Held and Concluded]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Amended Schedule C (Only)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.