U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-20213
  • Case Name: Sarah Elizabeth Komorowski
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Continue Hearing]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Objection]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Order]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Objection Deadline]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Relief from Stay]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Continuance of Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Hearing Set (Motion)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Objection]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Continue Hearing]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Objection Deadline]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Dismiss Case]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Continuance of Meeting of Creditors]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.