U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 23-10904
  • Case Name: Raul Macias Balderas, Jr.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Notice of Closing Information]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Request for Closing Information]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Trustee's Interim Report]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Certificate of Service]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Turnover]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Turnover]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.