U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 23-40276
  • Case Name: Samantha Nicole Burley
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Dismiss Case]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Hearing Held (Motion)]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Courtroom Minute Sheet]
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Change of Address]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Hearing]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Dismiss Case]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Convert Chapter 13 Case to Chapter 7]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.