U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10163
  • Case Name: William J Bisterfeldt
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC auto)]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Correct Defective Pleading(s)]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Amendments to Schedules D, E, F, G or H]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Amended Schedules]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Request for Notice]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Continuance of Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Financial Management Course]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.