U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-11045
  • Case Name: Teresa Marie Litton
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Continue Hearing]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Hearing Set (Other)]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Continue Hearing]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Objection Deadline]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Pay Wages (Employer)]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Release Wages]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.