U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-20397
  • Case Name: Suzanne H Hayden
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Trustee's Initial Report]
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Financial Management Course]
  • April 13, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Order on Application to Have Filing Fee Waived]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Declaration Regarding Filing (Self-Represented Individuals)]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Schedule I]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Verified Mailing Matrix]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Chapter 7 Statement of Monthly Income 122A-1 (Formerly Chapter 7 Means Test)]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Schedule H]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Schedule G]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Show Cause]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [AAutoAsignJudge7]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Correct Voluntary Petition]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Correct Voluntary Petition]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [BK Petition Preparer's Notice, Declaration and Signature - Form B119]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [BK Petition Preparer's Notice, Declaration and Signature - Form B119]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [BK Petition Preparer's Information]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [BK Petition Preparer's Information]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [DeBN Request Form]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [DeBN Request Form]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Employee Income Records]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Employee Income Records]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Statement About Your Social Security Number(s) (Form 121)]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Statement About Your Social Security Number(s) (Form 121)]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Waiver of Chapter 7 Filing Fee]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Waiver of Chapter 7 Filing Fee]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.