U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-40187
  • Case Name: Levi Caylen Skyler Young and Tonya Rene Young
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Meeting of Creditors Held and Concluded]
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Financial Management Course]
  • April 06, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 06, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 06, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Pay Wages (Employer)]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [AAutoAsignJudge13]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Support Document]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 [Support Document]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [DeBN Request Form]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 [DeBN Request Form]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Employee Income Records]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBR 1007.1(a)(2)(D))]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 [Employee Income Records]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBR 1007.1(a)(2)(D))]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13, Credit Card )]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13, Credit Card )]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.