U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 23-20582
  • Case Name: Jacquelyn Marie Royal
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Objection to Claim]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Post-Confirmation Amendment of Plan]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Pay Wages (Debtor)]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Certificate of Service]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Objection Deadline]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Amend Plan (Post-Confirmation)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.