U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:23-cv-01200
  • Case Name: Cloud v. Kansas, State of et al.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice Re Pro Se Mailing]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Reopen Case]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Mail Returned]
  • April 25, 2025: [Mail Returned]
  • April 23, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order]
  • April 23, 2025: [Consolidate Cases]
  • April 21, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 21, 2025: [Withdrawal and Entry of Appearance of Substituted Counsel]
  • April 18, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 17, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 14, 2025: [Exhibits]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Docket Text Modification]
  • April 04, 2025: [Exhibits]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.