U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-40192
  • Case Name: JT Johnson, Jr.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Extend/Shorten Time]
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Compel]
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Order on Generic Motion]
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Correct Defective Pleading(s)]
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Clerk's Notice of Hearing (with form)]
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Clerk's Notice of Service of Text Order]
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Continue Hearing]
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Financial Management Course]
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Objection]
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Hearing Held (Other)]
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Courtroom Minute Sheet]
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Meeting of Creditors Held and Concluded]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Response]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Objection]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Response]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Objection]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Clerk's Notice of Hearing (with form)]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Generic Motion]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Objection Deadline]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Correct Defective Pleading(s)]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Hearing Set (Motion)]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Hearing Set (Other)]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Generic]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Request for Notice]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Generic Notice]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Change of Address]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Response]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Objection]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Objection]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Expediting Hearing]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Generic Motion]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Amendments to Schedules D, E, F, G or H]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Amended Schedules]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Praecipe/Request]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Contempt]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Sanctions]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Extend/Shorten Time]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Compel]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Objection Deadline]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Vacate]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Withdraw Document]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Generic Motion]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Document]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Sanctions]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Turnover]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Courtroom Minute Sheet]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Hearing Held (Motion)]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Employee Income Records]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Clerk's Notice of Hearing (with form)]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Correct Voluntary Petition]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Document]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Generic Notice]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Sanctions]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Turnover]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Declaration Regarding Filing (Self-Represented Individuals)]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [DeBN Request Form]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Statement About Your Social Security Number(s) (Form 121)]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [AAutoAsignJudge13]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.