U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-40198
  • Case Name: Amber Marie Maxine Jensen
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Certificate of Service]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Set Last Day To File Proofs of Claim (Late Assets)]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Employ]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Notice of Recovery of Assets]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Employ]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Trustee's Initial Report]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Financial Management Course]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Request for Notice]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [AAutoAsignJudge7]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Order]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Order]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBR 1007.1(a)(2)(D))]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBR 1007.1(a)(2)(D))]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Employee Income Records]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [DeBN Request Form]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Employee Income Records]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [DeBN Request Form]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7, Credit Card )]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7, Credit Card )]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.