U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-40204
  • Case Name: Stacy Lyn Toney
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Certificate of Service]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Employ]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Receipt of Installment Payment (Not Final)]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Employ]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Trustee's Initial Report]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Order]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Amendments to Schedules D, E, F, G or H]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Amended Schedules]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [AAutoAsignJudge7]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [DeBN Request Form]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBR 1007.1(a)(2)(D))]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [DeBN Request Form]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBR 1007.1(a)(2)(D))]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Employee Income Records]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Employee Income Records]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7, Credit Card )]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7, Credit Card )]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.