U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10019
  • Case Name: Westen L. Alexander and Erin C. Alexander
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Trustee's Interim Report]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Delay Discharge]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Delay Discharge]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Proposed Abandonment of Property of the Estate]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Notice of Recovery of Assets]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Request for Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.