U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10314
  • Case Name: Jennifer Nicole Riggs
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Order on Application to Have Filing Fee Waived]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Schedule G]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Schedule E/F]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Employee Income Records]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Waiver of Chapter 7 Filing Fee]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Chapter 7 Statement of Monthly Income 122A-1 (Formerly Chapter 7 Means Test)]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Statement of Intent]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Debtor's Declaration Concerning Schedules]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Schedule J]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Schedule I]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Schedule H]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Schedule D]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Schedule C]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Schedule A/B]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Correct Voluntary Petition]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Waiver of Chapter 7 Filing Fee]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Correct Defective Pleading(s)]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [DeBN Request Form]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Declaration Regarding Filing (Self-Represented Individuals)]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Statement About Your Social Security Number(s) (Form 121)]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [AAutoAsignJudge7]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.