U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10320
  • Case Name: Carmen Joliet Hoffine
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Amendments to Schedules D, E, F, G or H]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Amended Creditor Matrix (Fee)]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC auto)]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Amendments to Schedules D, E, F, G or H]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Amended Creditor Matrix (Fee)]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Correct Defective Pleading(s)]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Employee Income Records]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Chapter 7 Statement of Monthly Income 122A-1 (Formerly Chapter 7 Means Test)]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Debtor's Declaration Concerning Schedules]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Schedule J]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Schedule I]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Schedule H]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Schedule G]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Schedule E/F]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Schedule D]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Schedule C]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Schedule A/B]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Correct Voluntary Petition]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Receipt of Installment Payment (Final)]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Generic Notice]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Declaration Regarding Filing (Self-Represented Individuals)]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [DeBN Request Form]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Statement About Your Social Security Number(s) (Form 121)]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [AAutoAsignJudge7]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.