U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-02199
  • Case Name: Lawson v. Godderz et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Petition]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 25, 2025: [Supplement]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 21, 2025: [Reassigning Case]
  • April 21, 2025: [Leave to Amend Complaint]
  • April 21, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • April 15, 2025: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 15, 2025: [Designation of Place of Trial]
  • April 15, 2025: [Jury Demand]
  • April 15, 2025: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • April 15, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.