U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-02074
  • Case Name: First Chicago Insurance Company v. Clark et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • April 28, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 23, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order]
  • April 23, 2025: [Consolidate Cases]
  • April 22, 2025: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 15, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 15, 2025: [Counterclaim]
  • April 15, 2025: [Entry of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.