U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10332
  • Case Name: Cory Wayne Johnston
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Change of Address]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Correct Defective Pleading(s)]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Change of Address]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Financial Management Course]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Statement of Presumed Abuse]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Statement of Declination]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Order]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [AAutoAsignJudge7]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBR 1007.1(a)(2)(D))]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [DeBN Request Form]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Employee Income Records]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7, Credit Card )]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.