U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-20030-5
  • Case Name: USA v. Marquez-Echeverria
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Detention (Oral)]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • April 28, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 28, 2025: [SEALED Pretrial Bond Report]
  • April 28, 2025: [SEALED Motion]
  • April 28, 2025: [Pretrial and Criminal Case Management Order]
  • April 28, 2025: [Detention]
  • April 28, 2025: [Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • April 28, 2025: [Financial Affidavit-CJA 23]
  • April 28, 2025: [Initial Appearance/Rule 5]
  • April 28, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 28, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 28, 2025: [Detention (Oral)]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order re: Due Process Protections Act]
  • April 25, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 25, 2025: [Arrest]
  • April 22, 2025: [Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • April 22, 2025: [Detention]
  • April 22, 2025: [Financial Affidavit-CJA 23]
  • April 22, 2025: [Initial Appearance/Rule 5]
  • April 22, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 22, 2025: [Detention (Oral)]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 16, 2025: [Pretrial and Criminal Case Management Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 16, 2025: [Detention]
  • April 16, 2025: [Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • April 16, 2025: [Financial Affidavit-CJA 23]
  • April 16, 2025: [Initial Appearance/Rule 5]
  • April 16, 2025: [~Util - Interpreter Needed]
  • April 16, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 16, 2025: [Detention (Oral)]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order re: Due Process Protections Act]
  • April 16, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 16, 2025: [Redacted Document]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • April 16, 2025: [Leave]
  • April 16, 2025: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.