U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:25-cr-10045-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ibarra
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - Public]
  • April 23, 2025: [Pretrial and Criminal Case Management Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 21, 2025: [Withdrawal and Entry of Appearance of Substituted Counsel]
  • April 16, 2025: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • April 16, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion for Detention (Oral)]
  • April 16, 2025: [Pretrial Conference]
  • April 16, 2025: [Indictment]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • April 16, 2025: [Unseal Case]
  • April 16, 2025: [SEALED Pretrial Bond Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.