U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-20487
  • Case Name: Anna Elizabeth Moe
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Reaffirmation Reviewed]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Financial Management Course]
  • April 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [AAutoAsignJudge7]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Order]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Order]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Affidavit]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Affidavit]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [DeBN Request Form]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [DeBN Request Form]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Employee Income Records]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBR 1007.1(a)(2)(D))]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Employee Income Records]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBR 1007.1(a)(2)(D))]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7, Credit Card )]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7, Credit Card )]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.