U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-cv-04040
  • Case Name: Washburn v. Social Security Administration
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • April 24, 2025: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
  • April 23, 2025: [State Court Records]
  • April 22, 2025: [Reassigning Case - Minute]
  • April 21, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • April 21, 2025: [Designation of Place of Trial]
  • April 21, 2025: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.