U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-02213
  • Case Name: Grand Theater Foundation, Inc. v. West Bend Mutual Insurance Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 28, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 28, 2025: [Counterclaim]
  • April 25, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 24, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 24, 2025: [Remand to State Court]
  • April 24, 2025: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 22, 2025: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
  • April 22, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • April 21, 2025: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.