open-public-records

U.S. District Court for the Western District of Kentucky

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky
    Case Number:5:19-cv-00099
    Party Name:United States of America v. Thurston et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:July 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed]
    Date Published:July 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Return of Service]
    Date Published:July 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:July 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Deficiency]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:November 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
    Date Published:November 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Initial Appearance - Rule 5(c)(3)]
    Date Published:November 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Waiver]
    Date Published:November 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:November 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
    Date Published:November 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Case Assignment]
    Date Published:November 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Sealed Document - Court User Only]
    Date Published:November 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Arrest - Rule 5]
    Date Published:November 13, 2015
  • Source: https://ecf.kywd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?96500
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 2 =