Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky
    Case Number:5:19-cv-00018
    Party Name:Points v. Green et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:April 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:March 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Notice of Deficiency (Court Use Only)]
    Date Published:March 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Letter]
    Date Published:February 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Deficiency]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assignment]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.kywd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?110760
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 1 =