open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky
    Case Number:4:19-cv-00017
    Party Name:Cook v. Southern Health Partners
  • Filing Type:Civil [Remark (Public)]
    Date Published:August 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Change of Address]
    Date Published:July 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:June 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum & Opinion]
    Date Published:June 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:June 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Mail Returned]
    Date Published:May 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:May 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:March 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
    Date Published:February 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Deficiency]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assignment]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.kywd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?110759
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 1 =